### Question

**If 64 x 52 = 17,48 x 56 = 23 and74 x 35 = 19, then 84 x 37 = ?**

A. 30

B. 22

C. 26

D. 24

**Answer: **B

**Solution:**

As, 64 x 52 (6 + 4) + (5 + 2) = 17

48 x 56 (4 + 8) + (5 + 6) = 23

and 74 x 35 (7 + 4) + (3 + 5) = 19

Similarly, 84 x 37 (8 + 4) + (3 + 7) = 22